IL SB2443 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the rates or payments for home health visits shall be as follows: $111 for dates of service from January 1, 2021 through December 31, 2021; and $131 for dates of service on and after January 1, 2022. Provides that the rates or payments for the certified nursing assistant component of the home health agency rate shall be as follows: $20 for dates of service prior to January 1, 2021; $25 for dates of service from January 1, 2021 through December 31, 2021; $30 for dates of service from January 1, 2022 through December 31, 2022; and $35 for dates of service on and after January 1, 2023. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-HOME HEALTH-RATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-23 | Senate | To Appropriations- Health |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5e | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2443&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2443.htm |