IL SB2438 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Creates a lottery scratch-off game for the United Negro College Fund in support of educational scholarships. Provides for the distribution and use of the net revenue from the scratch-off game. Provides the Department of the Lottery with rulemaking authority. Amends the State Finance Act to create the UNCF Scholarship Fund. Amends the School Code. Creates the UNCF Scholarship Fund Advisory Board. Provides for the composition and responsibilities of the Board. Effective immediately.
Title
UNCF-LOTTERY SCRATCH-OFF
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-06 | House | To Sales, Amusement, & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2021-04-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.119b | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1605 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1605 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1605 | 21.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1605 | 9.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.935 | New Code | See Bill Text |