IL SB2436 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0663
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0663
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. In a provision prohibiting the issuance or renewal of licenses to sell alcoholic liquor at retail within 100 feet of churches, schools, hospitals, and certain other buildings, provides that a local liquor control commissioner may grant an exemption to that prohibition if a local rule or ordinance authorizes the local liquor control commissioner to grant that exemption. Effective immediately.
Title
LIQUOR-SALE NEAR CHURCH/SCHOOL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-02 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0663 |
2018-08-02 | Senate | Effective Date August 2, 2018 |
2018-08-02 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-017-001 |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-18 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-05-17 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-05-14 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2018-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-02-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-000-000 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 6-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |