IL SB2432 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1048
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1048
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that a summons that otherwise complies with Supreme Court Rules and is properly served is not invalidated and the court's jurisdiction is not affected by an error in format. Provides that a summons is not defective if the named defendant is listed on a document attached to the summons. Provides that the changes to the Code of Civil Procedure are declarative of existing law set forth by the Illinois Supreme Court in Fleshner v. Copeland, 13 Ill.2d 72 (1958). Amends the Mortgage Rescue Fraud Act. Provides that it is a violation for a distressed property consultant to, among other things, enter into, enforce, or act upon any agreement with a foreclosure defendant, whether the foreclosure is completed or otherwise, if the agreement provides for a division of proceeds between the foreclosure defendant and the distressed property consultant derived from litigation related to the foreclosure. Effective immediately.
Title
SUMMONS/FORECLOSURE PROCEEDS
Sponsors
Sen. John Mulroe [D] | Sen. Jason Barickman [R] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] |
Sen. Robert Martwick [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1048 |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date August 23, 2018 |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | House | Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2018-05-30 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-012-001 |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-30 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2018-05-29 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-05-29 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2018-05-28 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-05-28 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 007-001-000 |
2018-05-24 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2018-05-24 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-05-22 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2018-05-16 | House | Remains in Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-05-16 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 001-002-000; -FAILED |
2018-05-09 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2018-05-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Mulroe |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 21, 2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 2-201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 940 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |