IL SB2403 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Allows the county board to impose an additional fee of $10 to $30 on convictions and grants of supervision for felonies, misdemeanors, petty offenses, and business offenses, to be used to support Court Appointed Special Advocate services. Effective immediately.
Title
COUNTIES CD-CASA FEE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2013 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Re-assigned to Local Government |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-1101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2403&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2403.htm |