IL SB2389 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning pupil residency and the payment of tuition.
Title
SCH CD-SUPP GENERAL STATE AID
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-08-09 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments; 3-9(b) |
2013-08-09 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments; 3-9(b) |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Daniel Biss |
2013-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Daniel Biss |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Daniel Biss |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2013-05-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-052-000 |
2013-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2013-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel and Pensions Committee; 006-003-000 |
2013-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2013-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2013-05-31 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2013-05-28 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-28 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-28 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 |
2013-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-05-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2013-05-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-10 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-05-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-07 | House | First Reading |
2013-05-06 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2013 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2013 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |