IL SB2388 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Savings Bank Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning rules and regulations.
Title
REGULATION-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 205 | 6014 | Amended Code | Citation Text |