IL SB2384 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes to the Pediatric Palliative Care Act. Makes changes to the definition of "serious illness". Restores language requiring the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to apply for a waiver to implement the pediatric palliative care program. Defines a qualifying child to be a person under the age of 21 who is enrolled in the medical assistance program and is diagnosed by the child's primary physician or specialist as suffering from a serious illness (rather than a person under 19 years of age who is enrolled in the medical assistance program and suffers from a serious illness). Provides that those serious illnesses that render a child eligible for pediatric palliative care services include any other serious illness that the Department, in consultation with interested stakeholders, determines to be appropriate. Restores language making certain reimbursable services offered under the pediatric palliative care program subject to federal approval for matching funds. Changes "case manager" to "program manager". Changes "qualifying participants" to "qualifying children".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEDIATRIC PALLIATIVE CARE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2021-06-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2021-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Health; 009-000-000
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Health
2021-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura Fine
2021-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 30, 2021
2021-05-29SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2021-05-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2021-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2021-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2021-05-28HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021
2021-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2021-05-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2021-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-25HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
2021-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2021-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2021-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2021-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2021-05-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2021-05-19HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-05-19HouseCommittee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2021
2021-05-15HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2021-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2021-04-26HouseArrived in House
2021-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
2021-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
2021-04-14SenateDo Pass Health; 014-000-000
2021-04-07SenateReported Back To Health; 005-000-000
2021-03-31SenateTo Subcommittee on Medicaid
2021-03-23SenateAssigned to Health
2021-03-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-5Amended CodeCitation Text
3056010Amended CodeCitation Text
3056015Amended CodeCitation Text
3056020Amended CodeCitation Text
3056025Amended CodeCitation Text
305603Repealed CodeCitation Text
3056030Amended CodeCitation Text
3056035Amended CodeCitation Text
3056037New CodeSee Bill Text
3056040Amended CodeCitation Text
3056045Amended CodeCitation Text
305605Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback