IL SB2380 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0588
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0588
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that grantees and employees of grantees shall not intentionally use grant funds, or goods or services purchased with grant funds, to engage, either directly or indirectly, in a prohibited political activity. Provides that grantees and employees of grantees shall not be compensated from grant funds for time spent engaging in a prohibited political activity. Specifies that a person who violates these provisions is guilty of a business offense and is subject to a fine of up to $5,000.
Title
ETHICS-NO GRANTS FOR POLITICS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0588 |
2013-08-27 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2013-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Criminal Law; 006-000-000 |
2013-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Criminal Law |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Christine Radogno |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 23, 2013 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2013-05-22 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2013-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2013-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 |
2013-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2013-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2013-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-05-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2013-05-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ron Sandack |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 020-000-000 |
2013-04-29 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2013-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2013 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2013 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 430 | 5-16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | 50-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |