IL SB2377 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Probation and Probation Officers Act. Provides that the Division of Probation Services shall reimburse the county or counties for 100% of the salary for all probation officer and supervisor positions approved for reimbursement by the division to meet pretrial services programs and specialty court programs. Provides that for the remaining probation officer positions engaged in basic services and new or expanded services approved of the total Statewide number as of July 1, 2021, beginning on July 1, 2022, 20 percent of that number shall be transferred to those requiring 100% salary reimbursement. Each subsequent July 1st, another 20 percent of the July 1,2021 population shall also be transferred under described circumstances.
Title
PROBATION-REIMBURSE
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-23 | Senate | To Appropriations- Judiciary |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John Connor |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 110 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2377&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2377.htm |