IL SB2365 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-07 - Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROCUREMENT-SCORING-DIVERSITY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-07HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-29HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2018-05-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2018-05-28HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-05-28HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 State Government Administration Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-05-28HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-28HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-05-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-05-25HouseArrived in House
2018-05-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-05-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 038-002-001
2018-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Clayborne
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Clayborne
2018-05-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 006-002-000
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 006-002-000
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - State Government
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-16SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-06SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51401.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback