IL SB2365 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
PROCUREMENT-SCORING-DIVERSITY
Sponsors
Sen. John Cullerton [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
Sen. Martin Sandoval [D] | Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Mike Fortner [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-12-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 8, 2019 |
2018-11-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2018-11-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-11-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-11-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2018-11-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 006-000-000 |
2018-11-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2018-11-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-11-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2018-11-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-07 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2018-05-28 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-05-28 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 State Government Administration Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-05-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-28 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-05-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 038-002-001 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Clayborne |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Clayborne |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 006-002-000 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 006-002-000 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - State Government |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |