IL SB2360 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the powers and duties of the State Board of Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EDUCATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-24SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2020-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2020-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2020-05-24SenateRule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As June 23, 2020
2020-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 17, 2020
2020-05-24SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2020-05-15SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020
2020-05-07SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020
2020-04-30SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020
2020-04-23SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020
2020-04-12SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2020-03-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020
2020-02-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 25, 2020
2020-02-20SenateSecond Reading
2020-02-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2020
2020-02-19SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2020-02-05SenateAssigned to Executive
2020-01-20SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2020-01-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2020-01-15SenateFirst Reading
2020-01-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10551A-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback