IL SB2350 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0996
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0996
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Career and Workforce Transition Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
SCHOOL LAW ENFORCEMENT DRILL
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] | Sen. William Cunningham [D] |
Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0996 |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 053-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-005-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000 |
2018-05-18 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-17 | House | Substitute House Sponsorship Request Accepted No Action Taken by Rules |
2018-05-09 | House | Substitute House Sponsorship Request Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-09 | House | Substitute House Sponsorship Request Filed Pursuant Rule 37(c) - Sen. Laura Murphy |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2018-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 012-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 151 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |