IL SB2333 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various Acts relating to the governance of public universities and community colleges in Illinois. Provides that if a student has a personal support worker through the Home-Based Support Services Program for Adults with Mental Disabilities under the Developmental Disability and Mental Disability Services Act, the governing board of the public university or community college district must permit the personal support worker to attend class with the student but is not responsible for providing or paying for the personal support worker. Provides that if the personal support worker's attendance in class is solely to provide personal support services to the student, the governing board may not charge the personal support worker tuition and fees for such attendance. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGHER ED-SUPPORT WORKER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-27 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-02-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2020-02-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 4, 2020 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 009-000-000 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 305 | 120 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 520 | 100 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 660 | 5-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 665 | 10-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 670 | 15-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 675 | 20-215 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 680 | 25-210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 685 | 30-220 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 690 | 35-215 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 805 | 3-29.14 | New Code | See Bill Text |