IL SB2323 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0649
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0649
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Prohibits the use of restraints on youth in care, including chemical, manual, and mechanical restraints, during the provision of any transportation services provided or arranged by the Department of Children and Family Services or its contractual assigns. Provides that any known, alleged, or suspected violation of the prohibition shall immediately be reported to the Department's Office of the Inspector General, the court presiding over the youth's case in accordance with the Juvenile Court Act of 1987, and the youth's attorney and guardian ad litem. Requires the Department to make a significant events report for any known, alleged, or suspected violation of the prohibition. Sets forth a list of circumstances that require the Department to prepare a written individualized trauma-sensitive transportation plan for any youth in care. Requires the Department to obtain court approval of the transportation plan in accordance with the Juvenile Court Act of 1987 as well as written approval of the transportation plan from the Department's Chief Deputy Director and the Chief Deputy Director of its Clinical Division. Contains provisions concerning information that must be included in a written individualized trauma-sensitive transportation plan; and Department reporting requirements. Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Requires the Department to ensure the provision of trauma-sensitive transport to minors placed in its care. Contains provisions concerning factors a court must consider when determining whether to approve an individualized trauma-sensitive transportation plan submitted by the Department. Effective immediately.
Title
DCFS-PROHIBITED RESTRAINTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0649 |
2021-08-27 | Senate | Effective Date August 27, 2021 |
2021-08-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Health; 011-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Health |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 27, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 109-003-000 |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-05-12 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-05-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-05-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2021-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-04-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-003-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Health; 010-002-000 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Reported Back To Health; 003-001-000 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-03-31 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Children & Family |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 505 | 4e | New Code | See Bill Text |
705 | 405 | 1-4.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |