IL SB2319 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Repeals a provision providing for the collection of an annual commercial distribution fee on vehicles of the second division weighing more than 8,000 pounds. Makes conforming changes. Effective July 1, 2017.
Title
VEH CD-REPEAL COM DISTRIB FEE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 22, 2016 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-01-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 20-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-402.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-815.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2319&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2319.htm |