IL SB2315 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. In a Section granting a homestead exemption to veterans with disabilities, provides that property that is used as a qualified residence by a veteran who was a member of the United States Armed Forces during World War II is exempt from taxation regardless of the veteran's level of disability. Provides that a veteran who qualifies as a result of his or her service in World War II need not reapply for the exemption. Makes changes concerning service-connected disabilities. Makes changes concerning surviving spouses. Creates a homestead exemption for surviving spouses of fallen police officers, fallen firefighters, and fallen rescue workers in an amount equal to 50% of the equalized assessed value of the property. Makes changes concerning the valuation of wastewater facilities. In provisions concerning the Historic Residence Assessment Freeze Law, provides that the fair cash value of the property shall be based on the final determination by the assessment officer, board of review, Property Tax Appeal Board, or court. Provides that, after the expiration of the 8-year valuation period, if the current fair cash value is less than the adjusted base year valuation, then the assessment shall be based on the current fair cash value. Makes changes concerning multi-township assessors. Provides that property that is used for a petroleum refinery may be the subject of a real property tax assessment settlement agreement among the taxpayer and taxing districts in which the property is situated. Amends the Park District Aquarium and Museum Act. Changes the Act's short title to the Park District and Municipal Aquarium and Museum Act. Replaces the Act's existing references to "city" and "cities" with "municipality" and "municipalities". Provides that the board of park commissioners or corporate authorities of a municipality (currently, only boards of park commissioners) may levy a tax if the park district or municipality has control of a public park or parks within the park district or municipality in which an aquarium or museum is maintained. Amends the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law of the Property Tax Code. Provides that extensions for levies made under the Park District and Municipal Aquarium and Museum Act are special purpose extensions and are not included in the park district's or municipality's aggregate extension. Creates an exemption for municipality-built homes. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-STANDARD EXEMPTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-11-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2023-12-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2023-11-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - November 9, 2023 |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2023-11-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly |
2023-11-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2023-11-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill |
2023-11-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2023-11-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-11-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-001 |
2023-11-09 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2023-11-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2023-11-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-11-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2023-11-09 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-11-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 012-000-000 |
2023-11-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2023-11-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-11-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2023-11-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2023-11-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-11-07 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2023-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-19 | House | Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2023 |
2023-05-12 | House | Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2023-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2023-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 019-000-000 |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2023-04-20 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Harry Benton |
2023-04-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2023-04-20 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2023-04-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2023-04-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2023-04-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2023-04-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2023-04-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2023-04-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2023-04-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr. |
2023-04-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr. |
2023-04-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver |
2023-04-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts |
2023-04-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2023-04-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2023-04-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2023-04-18 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-31 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2023-03-31 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2023-03-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 24, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |