IL SB2311 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Department of Corrections shall appoint a point of contact person who shall receive suggestions, complaints, or other requests to the Department from visitors to Department institutions or facilities and from other members of the public.
Title
CD CORR-POINT OF CONTACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2020-02-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 26, 2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 007-000-000 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-11-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-2-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |