IL SB2305 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, for taxable year 2018 and thereafter, the maximum income limitation under the senior citizens assessment freeze homestead exemption is $75,000 (currently, $65,000). Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-SENIOR FREEZE-INCOME
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-172 | Amended Code | Citation Text |