IL SB2299 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that election authorities may authorize service of objections to candidate nominations through electronic mail instead of personal service if the election authority responsible for convening the electoral board requires candidates to provide an electronic mail address where notices of objections and electoral board proceedings may be sent electronically instead of through personal service, requires objectors to provide an electronic mail address where notices and electoral board proceedings may be sent electronically instead of through personal service, and publishes notice of its decision to authorize service of objections to candidate nominations through electronic mail on its website within 5 business days after the effective date of the amendatory Act.
Title
ELECTIONS-SERVICE OF NOTICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Elections |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 10-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2299&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB2299.htm |