IL SB2298 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Industrial Hemp Act. Provides that a person desiring to grow, cultivate, or process industrial hemp or industrial hemp products must be licensed by the Department of Agriculture. Provides that the application for a license shall include the name and address of the applicant and the legal description of the land area, including Global Positioning System coordinates, to be used to cultivate industrial hemp. Provides that the Department may determine, by rule, the duration of a license and the requirements for license renewal. Preempts home rule powers. Amends the Illinois Noxious Weed Law. Provides that "noxious weed" does not include industrial hemp. Amends the Cannabis Control Act. Provides that "cannabis" does not include industrial hemp. Makes conforming changes in the State Finance Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INDUSTRIAL HEMP ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass as Amended Agriculture; 009-000-000
2018-04-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
2018-04-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-01-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Agriculture
2018-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.878New CodeSee Bill Text
5051002Amended CodeCitation Text
72055015.2Repealed CodeCitation Text
7205503Amended CodeCitation Text
7205508Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback