IL SB2279 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Specifies that provisions authorizing school districts to offer courses on hunting safety shall not be construed to allow anyone to bring certain weapons to school.
Title
SCH CD-HUNTING SAFETY-WEAPONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 18, 2020 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 014-001-000 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-10-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27-23.13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2279&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2279.htm |