IL SB2278 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0835
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0835
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Missing Persons Identification Act. Provides that the definition of "high-risk missing person" includes a person who is a veteran or active duty member of the United States Armed Forces, the National Guard, or any reserve component of the United States Armed Forces who is believed to have a physical or mental health condition that is related to his or her service.
Title
MISSING PERSONS-VETERANS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0835 |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000 |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2018-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-21 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-02-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 21, 2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 30, 2018 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Do Pass Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Veterans Affairs |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 722 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |