IL SB2276 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Sports Wagering Act in provisions concerning the Lottery sports wagering pilot program. Provides that the Department of the Lottery shall establish and publish the rules and procedures for the competitive bid process in issuing the central system provider license. Requires the winning bidder to pay no less than $10,000,000 (rather than paying $20,000,000) for the central system provider license. Allows the Department to choose whether to receive the payment in a lump sum immediately upon issuing the license or to receive partial payments over a period not to exceed one year. Requires the money to be deposited into the State Lottery Fund. Allows the Department to use up to $5,000,000 of the amount for costs of development and administration related to the Lottery sports wagering pilot program. Provides that the remainder shall be transferred to the Rebuild Illinois Projects Fund. Provides that sports lottery terminals may be placed in no more than 2,500 Lottery retail locations in the State in any one given year of the sports wagering pilot program (rather than during the first 360 days after the effective date of Public Act 101-31). Provides that the total number of retail locations of the Lottery sports wagering pilot program shall not exceed 5,000 after initial implementation of the Lottery sports wagering pilot program. Provides that the privilege tax due for Lottery sports wagering shall be transferred to the Capital Projects Fund on the last day of each month (rather than the 15th day of each month). Extends the repeal date of provisions concerning the Lottery sports wagering pilot program from January 1, 2024 to July 1, 2025. Makes other and conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SPORTS WAGERING-LOTTERY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-03-24SenateTo Executive- Gaming
2021-03-23SenateAssigned to Executive
2021-03-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2021-03-09SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Bill Cunningham
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2304525-70Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback