IL SB2274 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that a transfer between spouses does not disqualify wooded acreage from the provisions for the assessment of untransferred wooded acreage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-WOODS-SPOUSAL TRANSFER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-05-22SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-04-11HouseArrived in House
2018-04-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2018-02-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 13, 2018
2018-02-08SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-02-08SenateDo Pass Revenue; 005-000-000
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Revenue
2018-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520010-510Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback