IL SB2274 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0834
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0834
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that a transfer between spouses does not disqualify wooded acreage from the provisions for the assessment of untransferred wooded acreage.
Title
PROP TX-WOODS-SPOUSAL TRANSFER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0834 |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 13, 2018 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 005-000-000 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 10-510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |