IL SB2264 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that at least one of the 2 commissioners to the Legislative Ethics Commission appointed each by the President and Minority Leader of the Senate and the Speaker and Minority Leader of the House of Representatives must be a member of the general public. Provides that, other than a member of the General Assembly, a person is not eligible to serve as a commissioner if that person holds a partisan elected or political party office, or is otherwise an officer or employee of a political committee or political campaign. Effective immediately.
Title
LEGISLATIVE ETHICS COMMISSION
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] | Sen. Chris Nybo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-01-30 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-11-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 430 | 25-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2264&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2264.htm |