IL SB2260 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of State Police shall establish a Portal for use by federal, State, or local law enforcement agencies, including State's Attorneys and the Attorney General to capture a report of persons whose Firearm Owner's Identification Cards have been revoked or suspended. Creates the Firearm Recovery Task Force led by the State Police to seize and recover the Firearm Owner's Identification Cards of revoked persons and to enforce the revocation and suspension of Firearm Owner's Identification Cards under the Firearm Owner's Identification Card Act. Amends the Firearm Owner's Identification Card Act. Provides that the Department of State Police shall include in the report the reason the person's Firearm Owner's Identification Card was revoked or suspended. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides the defendant shall physically surrender all firearms in his or her possession to a law enforcement agency designated by the court to take custody of and impound the firearms and physically surrender his or her Firearm Owner's Identification Card to the law enforcement agency as a condition of remaining on bond pending sentencing when the offense the person has been charged with is a forcible felony, stalking, aggravated stalking, domestic battery, any violation of the Illinois Controlled Substances Act, the Methamphetamine Control and Community Protection Act, or the Cannabis Control Act that is classified as a Class 2 or greater felony, or any felony violation of the Deadly Weapons Article of the Criminal Code of 1961 or the Criminal Code of 2012. Amends the Freedom of Information Act and the Unified Code of Corrections to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE POLICE-FOID REVOCATION
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2605 | 2605-304 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 2605 | 2605-610 | New Code | See Bill Text |
430 | 65 | 3.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 65 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 65 | 8.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
430 | 65 | 9.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 110-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-6-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2260&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2260.htm |