IL SB2245 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-03 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-03 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Requires every insurer that amends, delivers, issues, or renews a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance, a managed care plan, or a qualified health plan offered for sale through the health insurance marketplace in this State providing coverage for hospital or medical treatment to provide coverage based upon medical necessity for the treatment of eating disorders. Provides that "eating disorder" includes, but is not limited to, anorexia nervosa, bulimia nervosa, pica, rumination disorder, avoidant/restrictive food intake disorder, other specified feeding or eating disorder (OSFED), and any other eating disorder contained in the most recent version of the Diagnostic and Statistical Manual of Mental Disorders published by the American Psychiatric Association. Effective immediately.
Title
INSURANCE-EATING DISORDERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-01-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 370c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2245&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2245.htm |