IL SB2241 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes various appropriations from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Human Services for family and community services and related distributive purposes. Effective July 1, 2023.
Title
$DHS-HOMELESSNESS PREVENTION
Sponsors
Sen. Adriane Johnson [D] | Sen. Doris Turner [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] |
Sen. Mike Simmons [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations - Health and Human Services |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2241&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/PDF/10300SB2241.pdf |