IL SB2236 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Invest in Kids Act. Provides that no credits may be awarded under the Act for any taxable year that begins in a State fiscal year for which the minimum statutory funding level is not met. Provides that the carry-forward period for those credits shall be suspended for any taxable year that begins in a State fiscal year for which the minimum statutory funding level is not met. Requires the State Board of Education to determine whether or not the State has met the minimum funding level for the fiscal year and to transmit a copy of the determination to the Department of Revenue. Effective immediately.
Title
INVEST IN KIDS-FUNDING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 21, 2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 30, 2018 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 009-004-000 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-10-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2236&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2236.htm |