IL SB2230 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that a consumer reporting agency may not impose a charge on a consumer for placing a freeze, removing a freeze, or temporarily lifting a freeze. Makes corresponding changes. Effective immediately.
Title
CREDIT FREEZE-NO FEE ALLOWED
Sponsors
Sen. John Cullerton [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. William Cunningham [D] |
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-01-06 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-10-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-10-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-09-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-09-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 505 | 2MM | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2230&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2230.htm |