IL SB2216 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Authorizes a class 1 brewer or class 2 brewer to obtain a beer showcase permit. Makes conforming changes. Provides that a class 3 brewer licensee who meets certain criteria may obtain a self-distribution exemption to allow the sale of not more than 77,500 (instead of 6,200) gallons of beer from each in-state or out-of-state class 3 brewery premises, which shall not exceed 232,500 (instead of 18,600) gallons annually in the aggregate, to retail licensees and certain brewers. Provides that a class 2 brewer may transfer up to 139,500 gallons (instead of 31,000 gallons) of beer to a brew pub wholly owned and operated by the class 2 brewer. With regard to special event retailer's licenses and special use permit licenses, provides that those licenses shall allow the licensee to sell and offer for sale, at retail, alcoholic liquors for consumption on or off the premises specified in the license (instead of for use or consumption), but not for resale in any form. Removes a provision requiring certain brewers to file a report of their water usage. Provides that any retail licensee or licensed manufacturer with retail privileges may offer incentives to consumers for participation in a consumer loyalty and reward program.
Title
LIQUOR-BEER-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Mike Porfirio [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
Sen. Rachel Ventura [D] | Sen. Paul Faraci [D] | Sen. Laura Ellman [D] | Sen. Celina Villanueva [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2023-03-09 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Liquor |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 1-3.43 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 5-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 6-40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
235 | 5 | 8-10.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2216&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB2216.htm |