IL SB2216 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-10-22 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Kotowski
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-10-22 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Kotowski
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. With respect to statements of economic interests, makes changes concerning: interests of spouses and immediate family members living with the person required to file; development of forms by the Secretary of State that replicate federal forms; supplemental filings by board and commission appointees; electronic filing; posting of statements by the Secretary of State in a searchable database on the Internet; and training by the Secretary of State for ethics officers and persons required to file statements. Effective immediately.
Title
GOVT ETHICS-ECONOMIC INTERESTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-22 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Kotowski | |
2009-04-03 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 3, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | To Executive Subcommittee on Ethics | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-02-25 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2216&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB2216.htm |