IL SB2196 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Labor Relations Act. Provides that, if a unit of local government provides for arbitration of impasses, the employer's financial ability to fund the proposals based on existing available resources shall be given primary consideration, if that ability is not predicated on certain revenue assumptions. Amends provisions concerning interest arbitration for security employee, peace officer, and fire fighter disputes. Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. For FY 2019 through FY 2023, requires the actual employer to contribute a portion of the employer's normal cost. Beginning in FY 2023, requires the employer to contribute the full employer's normal cost. Amends the School Code. Removes provisions concerning modification or waiver of rules regarding contracting with a commercial driver training school. Makes changes to provisions concerning: (i) incentives for school districts that reorganize or annex all of the territory of an entire school district; (ii) discharge of unfunded mandates; (iii) contracts for third party non-instructional services that are currently performed by an employee; and (iv) exceptions to physical education requirements. Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act. With respect to collective bargaining between an educational employer (other than the Chicago school district) and its employees' representative, provides that, when making wage and benefit determinations during interest arbitration, the employer's financial ability to fund the proposals based on existing available resources shall be given primary consideration, with certain exceptions. Amends the Prevailing Wage Act; exempts public works projects with an estimated project cost of $250,000 or less. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LABOR-SCHOOLS-PREVAILING WAGE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Labor
2017-05-02SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 12, 2017
2017-04-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-27SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-27SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-22.34cAmended CodeCitation Text
105511E-135Amended CodeCitation Text
10552-3.25gAmended CodeCitation Text
105522-62New CodeSee Bill Text
105527-24.2Amended CodeCitation Text
105527-6Amended CodeCitation Text
105527-7Amended CodeCitation Text
115510.7New CodeSee Bill Text
115512Amended CodeCitation Text
11554Amended CodeCitation Text
308058.41New CodeSee Bill Text
40516-158Amended CodeCitation Text
531514Amended CodeCitation Text
53157Amended CodeCitation Text
82013011cNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback