IL SB2195 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Provides optional separate benefits for persons who, on or after 6 months after the effective date, first become participants or members under the State Universities or Downstate Teachers Article or noncovered participants under the State Employee Article. Contains provisions concerning retirement conditions, the amount of the retirement annuity, the amount of the annual increases to the retirement annuity, the calculation of salary, and the amount of certain survivor benefits. Sets forth the amount of employee and employer contributions. Requires those retirement systems to establish a defined contribution plan for certain members. In the Chicago Teachers Article, establishes similar benefits if the governing body of the unit of local government adopts those benefits by resolution or ordinance. In the State Employee, State Universities, and Downstate Teachers Articles, requires those Systems to offer certain inactive members the opportunity to elect to receive an accelerated pension benefit payment equal to 70% of the net present value of their pension benefits in lieu of receiving any pension benefit. In the State Employee, State Universities, and Downstate Teachers Articles, makes funding changes. In the State Universities and Downstate Teachers Articles, shifts certain costs to the local employer. Makes other changes. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] | Sen. Kyle McCarter [R] | Sen. Tom Rooney [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-19 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (LA) |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-11 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (LA) |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 12, 2017 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 1-160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 1-161 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 1-162 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 14-103.41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 14-131 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-135.08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-147.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 14-152.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-155 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-155.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 14-155.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 14-156 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-156.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 15-108.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 15-108.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 15-155 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 15-165 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 15-185.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 15-198 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 15-200 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 15-200.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 15-201 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 15-201.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 16-107.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 16-158 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-190.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 16-203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-205 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-205.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 16-206 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-206.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 17-106.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 17-129 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 20-121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 20-123 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 20-124 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 20-125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2195&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2195.htm |