IL SB2192 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Grant Accountability and Transparency Act. Provides that the requirements established under the Act do not apply to State shared revenues distributed by formula to units of local government from the Local Government Distributive Fund, the Personal Property Tax Replacement Fund, the Motor Fuel Tax Fund, or the Transportation Renewal Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
GATA-APPLICABILITY
Sponsors
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 708 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |