IL SB2183 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0007
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0007
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
If and only if House Bill 156 of the 101st General Assembly becomes law, amends the Transportation Network Providers Act. Repeals the Act on January 1, 2027 (instead of June 1, 2021). Effective immediately.
Title
TRANSPORT NETWORK-REPEAL 2027
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0007 |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Effective Date May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-17 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-05-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-05-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-000 |
2021-05-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2021-05-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 015-000-000 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 57 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |