IL SB2179 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Amusement Ride and Attraction Safety Act. Provides that "amusement ride" includes any water slide, as defined by the Swimming Facility Act.
Title
AMUSEMENT RIDE-WATER SLIDE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 85 | 2-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2179&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2179.htm |