IL SB2175 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0254
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0254
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that during the first 180 days following a person's release from a penal institution, a court shall not order the person to pay any outstanding fines, taxes, or costs arising from a criminal proceeding involving the person.
Title
CRIM PRO-COST ASSESSMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - Motion in House (Y: 74 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - Motion in House (Y: 74 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0254 |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2024 |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2023-05-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-005-000 |
2023-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-17 | House | Racial Impact Note Request is Inapplicable |
2023-05-17 | House | Fiscal Note Request is Inapplicable |
2023-05-17 | House | Motion Prevailed 074-039-000 |
2023-05-17 | House | Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2023-05-15 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2023-05-12 | House | Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-12 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2023-05-12 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2023-05-11 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2023-05-11 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2023-05-11 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2023-05-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-10 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Ryan Spain |
2023-05-10 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Ryan Spain |
2023-05-10 | House | Racial Impact Note Requested by Rep. Ryan Spain |
2023-05-10 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. Ryan Spain |
2023-05-10 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Ryan Spain |
2023-05-10 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Ryan Spain |
2023-05-10 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Ryan Spain |
2023-05-10 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Ryan Spain |
2023-05-10 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Ryan Spain |
2023-05-09 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2023-05-03 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2023-05-02 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2023-05-02 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2023-05-02 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2023-05-02 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2023-05-02 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2023-05-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Restorative Justice; 006-002-000 |
2023-04-11 | House | Assigned to Restorative Justice |
2023-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-28 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2023-03-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2023-03-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-008-000 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Do Pass Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 010-000-000 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 124A-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |