IL SB2143 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that evidence of failure to comply with the seat belt requirements of the Illinois Vehicle Code may be admitted in litigation related to a motor vehicle accident for the purpose of mitigating damages in subsequent civil litigation. Provides that this mitigation will apply only to damages for pain and suffering and not to recovery of economic loss or medical payments. Maintains the prohibition on admission of evidence of failure to use child restraints as required under the Child Passenger Protection Act.
Title
SEAT BELT DAMAGE MITIGATION
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rezin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-13 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Tort Reform |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 12-603.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2143&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2143.htm |