IL SB2126 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-19 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-19 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that all the corporations, wherever incorporated or domiciled, that are members of a unitary business shall file a combined return as a combined group. Makes changes to the definition of "unitary business". Contains provisions concerning a water's edge election. Provides that, with respect to unitary business groups, "United States" means the 50 states of the United States, the District of Columbia, and United States' territories and possessions.
Title
INC TX-COMBINED REPORTING
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Peters [D] | Sen. Mike Simmons [D] | Sen. Ram Villivalam [D] | Sen. Omar Aquino [D] |
Sen. Robert Martwick [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 1501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 304 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 304.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2126&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2126.htm |