IL SB2123 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-21 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-21 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that sentence credit may be awarded to a prisoner for credit earned for good conduct, certain program participation, and educational credit, but that the award of credits may not reduce the sentence of the prisoner more than 5 years. Provides that a person serving a term of natural life imprisonment may not earn sentencing credit.
Title
CORRECTIONS-SENTENCE CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-6-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2123&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2123.htm |