IL SB2112 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0542
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0542
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a life company issuing an individual life insurance contract on or after January 1, 2022 shall notify an applicant, in writing on a form prescribed by the company at the time of application for the policy, of the applicant's right to designate a secondary addressee to receive notice of cancellation of the policy based on nonpayment of premium. Provides that the applicant may make the secondary addressee designation at the time of application for such policy or at any time such policy is in force by submitting a written notice to the insurer containing the name and address of the secondary addressee. Provides that an insurer's transmission to a secondary addressee of a copy of a notice of cancellation based on nonpayment of premium shall be in addition to the transmission of the original document to the policyholder, and that the copy of the notice of cancellation transmitted to the secondary addressee shall be made in the same manner and form required for the transmission of the notice to the policyholder. Provides that the designation of a secondary addressee shall not constitute acceptance of any liability on the part of the secondary addressee or insurer for services provided to the policyholder. Provides that the secondary notice requirement does not apply to any individual life insurance contract under which premiums are payable monthly or more frequently and are regularly collected by a licensed agent or are paid by credit card or any preauthorized check processing or automatic debit service of a financial institution. Provides that nothing in the language shall prohibit an applicant or policyholder from designating a life insurance agent of record as his or her secondary addressee. Effective January 1, 2022.
Title
INS CODE-LIFE INSURANCE/NOTICE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0542 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-20 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Insurance Committee; 018-000-000 |
2021-05-13 | House | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2021-05-11 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-11 | House | First Reading |
2021-05-07 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2021-05-07 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harris |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 014-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 013-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |