IL SB2102 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Pension Code. In the Regulation of Public Pension Funds Article, provides that the Consolidated Fund (instead of the Public Pension Division of the Department of Insurance or the Consolidated Fund, as appropriate) shall examine or investigate each pension fund established under the Downstate Police or Downstate Firefighter Article of the Code. In the Chicago Police and Chicago Firefighter Articles, repeals provisions requiring the Director of Insurance to biennially make a thorough examination of the Fund and issue a report. Effective July 1, 2023.
Title
PEN CD-EXAM AND INVESTIGATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2023-04-18 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-31 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2023-03-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Do Pass Senate Special Committee on Pensions; 010-000-000 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate Special Committee on Pensions |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 1A-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 5-226 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 6-220 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |