IL SB2080 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Electric Service Customer Choice and Rate Relief Law of 1997 of the Public Utilities Act. In provisions concerning infrastructure investment and modernization: Provides that beginning in 2022, a participating utility other than a combination utility shall pay $10,000,000 per year for 5 years and a participating utility that is a combination utility shall pay $1,000,000 per year for 10 years to the energy low-income and support program, which is intended to fund customer assistance programs with the primary purpose being avoidance of imminent disconnection and reconnecting customers who have been disconnected for nonpayment and makes conforming changes. Makes a change concerning the computation of the performance-based formula rate beginning with the rates applicable for the rate year commencing January 1, 2023, and each rate year thereafter. Removes provisions requiring that, by December 31, 2017, the Illinois Commerce Commission shall prepare and file with the General Assembly a report on the infrastructure program and the performance-based formula rate; provisions making the infrastructure investment and modernization, Smart Grid Advanced Metering Infrastructure Deployment Plan, Illinois Science and Energy Innovation Trust, and Illinois Smart Grid test bed provisions inoperative after December 31, 2022; and provisions limiting the ability of a participating utility to annually update the performance-based formula rate. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
UTILITIES-INFRASTRUCTURE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 10, 2019 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 2, 2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Do Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 018-000-001 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 16-108.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |