IL SB2069 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0427
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0427
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Creates the offense of false personation of a peace officer while serving process. Provides that a person commits the offense when he or she, not being a peace officer, knowingly wears a coat, hat, or other clothing while serving process that reasonably creates the impression that the person is a peace officer. Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. With respect to the requirement that a person who is a licensed or registered private detective or a registered employee of a private detective agency must supply the sheriff of any county in which the person serves process with a copy of the person's license or certificate, deletes language providing that the failure of a person to supply a copy of the license or certificate to the sheriff does not impair the validity of process served by the person. In a provision that allows a court to appoint a certified private detective agency as a special process server, deletes language allowing any employee of the private detective agency to serve the process under the appointment.
Title
CIV PRO-PROCESS SERVERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0427 |
2011-08-16 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-08-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-06-17 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2011-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 |
2011-04-25 | House | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2011-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. William Cunningham |
2011-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; J. Collins |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 007-000-000 |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2011 |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 29, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | To Criminal Law Subcommittee on Special Issues |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 32-5.2-6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
735 | 5 | 2-202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |