IL SB2043 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that on and after January 1, 2012, electronic benefits transfer cards ("LINK") used to obtain SNAP (formerly known as food stamps) benefits or cash shall contain the name and photo of the cardholder. Establishes that an individual may only use the LINK card if the photo on the card matches the user. Provides that on the effective date of the amendatory Act the Department of Human Services shall begin the process of transitioning to the use of LINK cards which contain the name and photo of the cardholder. Requires the transition to be completed no later than January 1, 2012. Effective immediately.
Title
DHS-LINK CARD-PHOTO ID
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-08 | Senate | To Human Services Subcommittee on Special Issues; - 3/14/2011 - Held |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Carole Pankau |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2043&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB2043.htm |