IL SB2038 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Equal Pay Act of 2003. Provides that an employer or employment agency shall disclose in each public and internal posting for each job, promotion, transfer, or other employment opportunity the wage or salary, or the wage or salary range, and a general description of the benefits and other compensation to be offered for the job, promotion, transfer, or other employment opportunity. Provides that an employer shall announce, post, or otherwise make known all opportunities for promotion to all current employees on the same calendar day and prior to making a promotion decision. Provides that an employer shall provide an employee the current wage or salary range and a general description of the benefits and other compensation for the position in which the employee is employed upon hire, promotion, or transfer and at least annually thereafter and upon the employee's request. Provides that the Department of Labor may initiate its own investigations and file its own complaints in response to a violation of the Act. Makes other changes. Effective January 1, 2024.
Title
EQUAL PAY-SALARY TRANSPARENCY
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Mike Simmons [D] | Sen. Robert Peters [D] | Sen. Celina Villanueva [D] |
Sen. Rachel Ventura [D] | Sen. Karina Villa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), the following amendments will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 112 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 112 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 112 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |